MA H4076 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4070). December 14, 2017.
Title
Amending the charter of the city of Malden
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-12-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-12-26 | House | Enacted |
2017-12-26 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2017-12-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-12-14 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2017-12-14 | House | Substituted for H4070 |
Same As/Similar To
H4070 (Similar To) 2017-12-14 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4076
H816 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1676 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
H4016 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2018
H4056 (Similar To) 2017-12-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4070
H4926 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H816 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1676 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
H4016 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2018
H4056 (Similar To) 2017-12-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4070
H4926 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4076 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4076.pdf |