MA H4959 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Attleboro be authorized to regulate rent and evictions in mobile home park accommodations in said city. Housing.
Title
Providing for rent regulation and control of evictions in mobile home park accommodations in the city of Attleboro
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/09/2020 from 09:00 AM-04:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-10 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4959 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4959.pdf |