MA H4952 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize Jason Restituyo to take the civil service examination for the position of police officer in the city of Haverhill, notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing Jason Restituyo to take the civil service examination for the position of police officer in the city of Haverhill notwithstanding the maximum age requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-08-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/09/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-07-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-07-31 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4951 (Similar To) 2024-08-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4950 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4860 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4950 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4860 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4952 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4952.pdf |