MA H4942 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bicycle safety
Title
Bicycle safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-09-29 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2022-09-29 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2022-09-29 | House | Accompanied by H3511 and H3567 |
2022-09-29 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H5214 (Replaces) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5302
H4923 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5252
H5061 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5223
H5252 (Similar To) 2022-12-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2022
H5223 (Similar To) 2022-12-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2022
H3511 (Replaces) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
H3567 (Replaces) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2350 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
S2090 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
H5005 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4966 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4113 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4944 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5304 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4923 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5252
H5061 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5223
H5252 (Similar To) 2022-12-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2022
H5223 (Similar To) 2022-12-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2022
H3511 (Replaces) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
H3567 (Replaces) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2350 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
S2090 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
H5005 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4966 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4113 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4944 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5304 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4942 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4942.pdf |