MA H4927 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4827
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 209 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 209 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the University of Massachusetts to convey a certain parcel of land and buildings to the city of Waltham
Title
Authorizing the University of Massachusetts to convey a certain parcel of land and buildings to the city of Waltham
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on Higher Education | Rep. John Lawn [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-17 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #285 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-05 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 269 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-05 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 269 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 209 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Enacted - see Roll Call #285 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2020-11-05 | House | Enacted - 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 269) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-10-29 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-10-26 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2020-09-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Amended (Barrett) by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2906 |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second |
2020-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-31 | House | New draft of H4827 |
2020-07-31 | House | Pending new draft of H4827 |
2020-07-31 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4827 (Replaces) 2020-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4927