MA H4924 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1396
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To promote the well-being of minor children living with guardians
Title
To promote the well-being of minor children living with guardians
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | Rep. Paul Donato [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-31 | House | New draft of H1396 |
2020-07-31 | House | Pending new draft of H1396 |
2020-07-31 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H1396 (Replaces) 2020-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4924
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4924 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4924.pdf |