MA H4907 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4875
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 328 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 328 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Ayer to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises.
Title
Authorizing the town of Ayer to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 328 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-13 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-11-26 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-09-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-09-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-09-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-09-13 | House | New draft of H4875 |
2018-09-13 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4875 (Replaces) 2018-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4907
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5017 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 402 of the Acts of 2018
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5017 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 402 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4907 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4907.pdf |