MA H4875 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4907
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4907
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4907
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Ayer be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Ayer to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises for the vineyard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4907 |
2018-09-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/06/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-08-09 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H1994 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4907 (Replaced by) 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 328 of the Acts of 2018
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H1994 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4907 (Replaced by) 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 328 of the Acts of 2018
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4875 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4875.pdf |