MA H4863 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Beverly be authorized to lease a certain parcel of land in said city currently held by the Beverly Harbor Management Authority for park and recreational purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to 1 Water Street in Beverly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 251 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #268 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #268 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #268 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2020-07-30 | House | Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 251) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-28 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-07-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |