MA H4847 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-21 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4988
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-21 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4988
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Billerica be authorized to change the name of the board of selectmen in said town to the select board. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to change the name of the board of selectmen of the town of Billerica to select board to exhibit gender neutrality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4988 |
2020-09-21 | House | Read third |
2020-09-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-08-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-08-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-08-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-07-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-09 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4847 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4847.pdf |