MA H4830 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3389
Note: Legislation replaced by H5096
Note: Legislation replaced by H5096
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - New draft substituted, see H5096
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - New draft substituted, see H5096
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To study the development of an underground railroad, civil rights and black heritage museum and cultural center in Springfield
Title
To study the development of an underground railroad, civil rights and black heritage museum and cultural center in Springfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-26 | House | New draft substituted, see H5096 |
2022-07-26 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-07-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2022-07-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2022-07-26 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H5096 |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-06-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-06-02 | House | New draft of H3389 |
2022-06-02 | House | Reported from the committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
H3389 (Replaces) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4830
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H286 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1842 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H5096 (Replaced by) 2022-07-26 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H286 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1842 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H5096 (Replaced by) 2022-07-26 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4830 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4830.pdf |