MA H4821 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Section 29 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2019 (see House, No. 4800), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment C of House, No. 4833). July 27, 2018.
Title
Relative to the payment of pensioners for services after retirement
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-08-06 | House | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-08-06 | House | For message, see H4870 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor returned to the House with veto |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2018-08-01 | House | Re-enacted |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Governors amendment rejected |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-30 | House | Governors amendment rejected |
2018-07-30 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2018-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-07-26 | House | For message, see H4833, Attachment C |
2018-07-26 | House | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment |
2018-07-26 | House | Enacted as section 29 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H4800 |
Same As/Similar To
H4800 (Replaced by) 2018-07-30 - Item 7008-1116 passed over veto - see Roll Call #537 [YEAS 35 to NAYS 1]
H4833 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4870 (Replaced by) 2018-08-06 - See H4821
S2065 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2017
S2064 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2017
S2078 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2450
S2087 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3828 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2480 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - See S2372
S2665 (Similar To) 2018-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2018
H4833 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4870 (Replaced by) 2018-08-06 - See H4821
S2065 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2017
S2064 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2017
S2078 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2450
S2087 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3828 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2480 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - See S2372
S2665 (Similar To) 2018-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4821 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4821.pdf |