MA H4805 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 353 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 353 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Charlton be authorized to appoint two alternate members of the conservation commission of said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the membership of the Conservation Commission of the Town of Charlton
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 353 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-27 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-07-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1535 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H3798 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3901
H4630 (Similar To) 2018-07-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2660 (Similar To) 2018-09-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3798 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3901
H4630 (Similar To) 2018-07-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2660 (Similar To) 2018-09-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4805 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4805.pdf |