MA H4796 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5004
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Mark of Peru, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Paul W. Mark that the Massachusetts Teachers' Retirement Board be authorized to grant creditable service to Susan Floyd. Public Service.
Title
Relative to creditable service for Susan Floyd
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5004 |
2020-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2020-06-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5004 (Replaced by) 2020-10-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4796 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4796.pdf |