MA H4747 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4342
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Rochester to grant an additional license for the sale of alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Rochester to grant an additional license for the sale of alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-05-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-05-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-05-12 | House | New draft of H4342 |
2022-05-12 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4342 (Replaces) 2022-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4747
H418 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5438
H3740 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H3739 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3895
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H418 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5438
H3740 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H3739 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3895
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4747 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4747.pdf |