MA H4342 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4747
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4747
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4747
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Rochester be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Rochester to grant an additional license for the sale of alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4747 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday December 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/31/2022 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H418 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5438
H3740 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H3739 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3895
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021
H3895 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2021
H4747 (Replaced by) 2022-06-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3740 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H3739 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3895
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021
H3895 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2021
H4747 (Replaced by) 2022-06-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4342 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4342.pdf |