MA H4744 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the committee on Housing to make an investigation and study of certain House documents concerning expiring use
Title
Expiring Use
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-12 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied by H649, H654, H683, H2246, H3017, H3018, H3019 and H3541 |
2018-07-12 | House | Reported from the committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H649 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H654 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H683 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H2246 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H3017 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H3018 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H3019 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H3541 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
S94 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
H978 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H703 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H704 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H651 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H654 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H683 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H2246 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H3017 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H3018 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H3019 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
H3541 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
S94 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
H978 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H703 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H704 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H651 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4744 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4744.pdf |