MA H3019 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4744
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4744
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to low and moderate income tenants and expiring use housing units. Housing.
Title
Protecting low and moderate income tenants and expiring use housing units
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4744 |
2018-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H704 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H650 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H665 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S726 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2402
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2242 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4744 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H650 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H665 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S726 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2402
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2242 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4744 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3019 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3019.pdf |