MA H4725 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Hearing: May 27 @ 11:00 am in Virtual Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Melrose be authorized to convert up to three licenses for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk off the premises to licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk off the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city of Melrose to convert certain liquor licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages for off premises consumption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22JointHearing scheduled for 05/27/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2020-05-21SenateSenate concurred
2020-05-18HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback