MA H5171 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4725
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the city of Melrose to convert certain liquor licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages for off premises consumption
Title
Authorizing the city of Melrose to convert certain liquor licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages for off premises consumption
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-12-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-12-10 | House | New draft of H4725 |
2020-12-10 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4725 (Replaces) 2020-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5171
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5171 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5171.pdf |