MA H4722 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4459
Note: Legislation replaced by H4789
Note: Legislation replaced by H4789
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4789
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4789
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to strengthening Massachusetts' economic leadership
Title
Relative to strengthening Massachusetts' economic leadership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | House | New draft substituted, see H4789 |
2024-06-27 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2024-06-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-06-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2024-06-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2024-06-24 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4789 |
2024-06-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2024-06-05 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2024-06-05 | House | New draft of H4459 |
2024-06-05 | House | Reported from the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4459 (Replaces) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4722
S2482 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2548
H4789 (Replaced by) 2024-06-27 - Published as amended, see H4804
H4804 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - Committee of conference appointed (Finegold-Rodrigues-Durant), in concurrence
H4935 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - See H4800
S2482 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2548
H4789 (Replaced by) 2024-06-27 - Published as amended, see H4804
H4804 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - Committee of conference appointed (Finegold-Rodrigues-Durant), in concurrence
H4935 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - See H4800
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4722 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4722.pdf |