MA H4710 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4717
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4717
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4717
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to residential real property exemptions. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the residential exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4717 |
2016-10-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2016 from 11:45 AM-01:00 PM in B1 |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-10-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4717 (Replaced by) 2016-12-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2016
H573 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H574 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H575 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H576 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3178 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Senate concurred
H573 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H574 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H575 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H576 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3178 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4710 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4710.pdf |