MA H4702 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Gentile of Sudbury, a petition of Carmine L. Gentile (by vote of the town) that certain disabled residents in the town of Sudbury be authorized to vote remotely by telephone. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a remote voting system for town meeting in the town of Sudbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-11-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-11-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-11-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-10-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H2524 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4030
H682 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
H2308 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1338 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3239 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied S415
H682 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
H2308 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1338 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3239 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied S415
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4702 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4702.pdf |