MA H4687 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Northfield be authorized to continue the employment of Floyd Dunnell, III as fire chief of said town. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Northfield to continue the employment of Floyd Dunnell, III
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-05-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4048 (Similar To) 2023-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2023
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4048
H4404 (Similar To) 2024-05-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4048
H4404 (Similar To) 2024-05-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4687 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4687.pdf |