MA H4637 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to real estate transfer fees and senior property tax relief in the city of Boston. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to real estate transfer fees and senior property tax relief
Sponsors
Rep. Brandy Fluker Oakley [D] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] | Sen. Liz Miranda [D] | Rep. Rob Consalvo [D] |
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-09-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-09-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-09-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-08-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-06-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/07/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2022-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4637 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4637.pdf |