MA H4627 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 394 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 394 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Stockbridge be authorized to transfer original documents to the Stockbridge-Munsee Community of the Mohican Nation. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the transfer of original documents to the Stockbridge-Munsee Community of the Mohican Nation from the town of Stockbridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 394 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-29 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-10-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-05-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-04-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/20/2022 from 02:30 PM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4097 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
H4316 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2022
H4297 (Similar To) 2022-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 279 of the Acts of 2022
H4316 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2022
H4297 (Similar To) 2022-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 279 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4627 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4627.pdf |