MA H4626 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-4)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Recommitted to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to appropriate funds to the Massachusetts Emergency Management Agency for emergency funding for certain homeless services. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing emergency funding for homeless services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseRecommitted to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2020-05-21HouseRules suspended
2020-05-21HouseOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
2020-04-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-30HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2020-03-27HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback