MA H4622 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 78-2)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to relief payments for recipients of the transitional aid to families with dependent children and emergency aid to the elderly, disabled and children programs within the Department of Transitional Assistance. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To provide short-term relief for families in deep poverty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-04-08 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2020 from 01:30 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-04-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2020 from 01:30 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2020-03-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4622 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4622.pdf |