MA H4576 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - New draft substituted, see H4739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - New draft substituted, see H4739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve grid resiliency through energy storage
Title
To improve grid resiliency through energy storage
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | New draft substituted, see H4739 |
2018-07-11 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2018-07-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2018-07-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2018-07-11 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4739 |
2018-07-11 | House | Order adopted, see H4733 |
2018-06-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-06-07 | House | New draft of H2600 |
2018-06-07 | House | Reported from the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2600 (Replaces) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4576
H1570 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1572 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1565 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1600 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4733 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4739 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied H4756
H1570 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1572 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1565 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1600 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4733 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4739 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied H4756
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4576 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4576.pdf |