MA H4567 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 481 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 481 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of headlights
Title
Relative to the use of headlights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 481 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Committee recommended that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-12-24 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-12-22 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-22 | House | Substituted for H3092 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4567 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4567.pdf |