MA H4542 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the powers and duties of the board of health in the city of Chicopee. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Board of Health of the city of Chicopee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-12-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-12-29 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-24 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-24 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-12-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-12-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-12-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-12-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4542 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4542.pdf |