MA H4539 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-01 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-01 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Robin Waine, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Robin Waine an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-09-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-09-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-08-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-07-18 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-06-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3828 (Similar To) 2016-12-08 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4754
H3831 (Similar To) 2016-04-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2016
H3827 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H4006 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2016
H3831 (Similar To) 2016-04-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2016
H3827 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H4006 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4539 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4539.pdf |