MA H3828 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4754
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4754
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4754
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Everett be authorized to establish a linkage fee revolving fund. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Everett to establish a linkage fee revolving fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4754 |
2016-12-08 | House | Read third |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-01-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-10-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3831 (Similar To) 2016-04-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2016
H3827 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H4006 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2016
H4539 (Similar To) 2016-09-01 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4754 (Replaced by) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
H3827 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H4006 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2016
H4539 (Similar To) 2016-09-01 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4754 (Replaced by) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3828 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3828.pdf |