MA H4535 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 457 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 457 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to boat excise tax revenue for the Mattapoisett Waterfront By Mr. Straus of Mattapoisett, a petition of William M. Straus and Mark C. Montigny (by vote of the town) that the town of Mattapoisett be authorized to credit the boat excise tax to the Municipal Waterway Fund. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to boat excise tax revenue for the Mattapoisett Waterfront
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 457 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-12-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-12-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-12-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/02/2014 from 10:30 AM-11:30 AM in B-1 |
2014-11-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-11-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4535 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4535.pdf |