MA H4534 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Worcester be authorized to lease a certain building. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the City of Worcester to lease a certain building
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-28 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2018-12-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-03 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-06-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-06-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-06-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-06-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4473 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4503
H4503 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2018
S2629 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 257 of the Acts of 2018
H4503 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2018
S2629 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 257 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4534 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4534.pdf |