MA H4473 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4503
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Minuteman Regional Vocational Technical School District to lease certain land and buildings. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing the Minuteman regional vocational technical school district to lease certain land and buildings
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Kaufman [D] | Sen. Cindy Friedman [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Rep. Denise Garlick [D] |
Rep. Kate Hogan [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
Sen. Michael Rush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4503 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4503 (Replaced by) 2018-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2018
H4534 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2018
H4534 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4473 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4473.pdf |