MA H4525 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 452 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 452 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority to release an easement upon certain real property in the city of Quincy By Representative Mariano of Quincy and Senator Keenan, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Ronald Mariano and John F. Keenan authorizing the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority to release an easement on a certain parcel of land in the city of Quincy. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority to release an easement upon certain real property in the city of Quincy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 452 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-12-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-12-08 | House | Rule suspended |
2014-12-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-12-08 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-11-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-11-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-10-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2014-10-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4525 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4525.pdf |