MA H4521 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Maryann Donie, an employee of the Executive Office of Technology Services and Security. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Maryann Donie, an employee of the Executive Office of Technology Services and Security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-03-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-03-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S1761 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S1742 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S15 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2021
S37 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2021
S1761 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S1742 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S15 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2021
S37 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4521 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4521.pdf |