MA H4519 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disposition of certain land in the town of West Brookfield. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for the disposition of certain land in the town of West Brookfield
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-26 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #218 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #218 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-07-26 | House | Enacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY, No. 235) |
2022-07-21 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2022-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S3025 |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Read third |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-05-02 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-04-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-04-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-04-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-04-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-03-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/14/2022 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2021-10-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4519 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4519.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall218.pdf |