MA H4511 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4636
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Muradian of Grafton and Senator Moore, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of David K. Muradian, Jr., and Michael O. Moore (by vote of the town) that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to convey certain parcels of land at the former Grafton State Hospital to the town of Grafton. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain parcels of land in the town of Grafton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4636 |
2018-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-14 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2018-05-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S1686 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
H3850 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4261
H4615 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4802
H4637 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
H4635 (Similar To) 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2018
H4636 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 223 of the Acts of 2018
H4769 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4816
H4802 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H4816 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2018
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S1686 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
H3850 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4261
H4615 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4802
H4637 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
H4635 (Similar To) 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2018
H4636 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 223 of the Acts of 2018
H4769 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4816
H4802 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H4816 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4511 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4511.pdf |