MA H4816 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4769
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain land to the town of Foxborough for fire department use.
Title
Authorizing the Commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain land to the town of Foxborough for fire department use.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 489 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 489 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted - Roll Call #552 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 489 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted - Roll Call #552 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #552 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] |
2018-07-31 | House | Enacted - 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 489) |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-30 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-30 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2018-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Ordered of the Day |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-25 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-25 | House | New draft of H4769 |
2018-07-25 | House | Pending new draft of H4769 |
2018-07-25 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4769 (Replaces) 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4816
H4637 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H76 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4637 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H76 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken