MA H4510 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4814
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4814
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4814
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Golden of Lowell, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Thomas A. Golden, Jr., and others that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to transfer certain parcels of land in the town of Chelmsford. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the sale of real property in Chelmsford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | House | New draft substituted, see H4814 |
2018-07-25 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2018-07-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2018-07-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2018-07-25 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4814 |
2018-06-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2018-05-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3750 (Similar To) 2017-07-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3841
H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H4071 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Consolidated with H4124
H4124 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4243
H3841 (Similar To) 2017-08-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3880
H4814 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 192 of the Acts of 2018
H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H4071 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Consolidated with H4124
H4124 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4243
H3841 (Similar To) 2017-08-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3880
H4814 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 192 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4510 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4510.pdf |