MA H4071 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Consolidated with H4124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the authority of the town manager in the town of Chelmsford. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending The Charter Of The Town Of Chelmsford Relative To Town Manager, Administrative Powers And Duties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseConsolidated with H4124
2018-01-29HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-01-29HouseRules suspended
2018-01-29HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-01-11HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-12-14SenateSenate concurred
2017-12-11HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H3930 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2018
H1097 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3930
S1131 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3918 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2018
H4102 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4124 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4243
H2423 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3725 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2018
H3750 (Similar To) 2017-07-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3841

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback