MA H4507 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the board of selectmen of the town of Clinton to appoint the town collector By Representative Naughton of Clinton and Senator Chandler, a joint petition of Harold P. Naughton, Jr., Harriette L. Chandler and Jennifer L. Flanagan (by vote of the town) that the board of selectmen of the town of Clinton be authorized to appoint the town collector for said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the board of selectmen of the town of Clinton to appoint the town collector
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-12-29 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-12-24 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-11-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-11-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-11-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-10-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4507 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4507.pdf |