MA H4503 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 421 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 421 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the amount of money that may be borrowed by the Thorndike Fire and Water District in the town of Palmer. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Increasing the amount of money that may be borrowed by the Thorndike Fire and Water District in the town of Palmer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 421 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-12-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-12-24 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-11-06 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-10-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-10-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-10-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-10-02 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2014-09-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4503 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4503.pdf |