MA H450 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1971
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Accompanied S1971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Accompanied S1971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Southern Worcester County Regional Vocational School District to enter into solar power generation agreements. Education.
Title
Authorizing the Southern Worcester County Regional Vocational School District to enter into solar power generation agreements
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Sen. Peter Durant [R] |
Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Accompanied S1971 |
2019-04-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1971 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H450 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H450.pdf |