MA H450 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4582
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide reimbursements for certain informational technology enhancements in compliance with the Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC). Education.
Title
Relative to Informational Technology Upgrade Reimbursements for PARCC Compliance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4582 |
2015-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4582 (Replaced by) 2016-08-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1757 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
H732 (Similar To) 2016-02-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3056 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1526 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H114 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1757 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
H732 (Similar To) 2016-02-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3056 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1526 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H114 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H450 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H450.pdf |