MA H4478 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a Bill designating a certain bridge in the city of Lynn as the Army SPC Antonio J. Syrakos foot bridge (House, No. 3743). February 24, 2020.
Title
Designating a foot bridge in Lynn Heritage State Park, in the city of Lynn as the Gold Star Families Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-05-07 | House | Enacted |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-02-24 | House | Substituted for H3743 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4478 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4478.pdf |