MA H4476 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4806
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the use of hydrofluorocarbon substitutes. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to regulation of hydrofluorocarbons substitutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4806 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 18, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/09/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-14 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S171 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1394 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
S798 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S66 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S1553 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4806 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1394 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
S798 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S66 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S1553 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4806 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4476 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4476.pdf |