MA H4458 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 243 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 243 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Revere be authorized to establish penalties and liens for certain water meter ordinance violations. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to Water Meter Ordinance Violations – Penalties And Liens in the City of Revere
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 243 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-09-06 | House | Enacted |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-05-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-05-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-05-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1912 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S1676 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
H3384 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3874 (Similar To) 2017-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2017
H3876 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2017
H4972 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4993
S1676 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
H3384 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3874 (Similar To) 2017-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2017
H3876 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2017
H4972 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4993
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4458 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4458.pdf |